Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Banks, Michael L., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Silvia Garcia, R Davis, Matthew Cates, Lee Ann Sauceda, Janet Rodriguez, (total of 12) See All represented by Kathleen J Williams, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions245 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time253 days |
Statement - Other (of Punitive Damages) filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of opposition to demurrer) filed.
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: August 03, 2011Notice of Entry - Other (Defendants' Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: August 11, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of L R Wagley in lieu of reply in support) filed.
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer) filed.
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Leslie R Wagley in support of motion to dismiss) filed.
Date: June 16, 2011Reply (in support) filed.
Date: 2011-04-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer) filed.
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2011-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss filed.
Date: June 16, 2011Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion to dismiss) filed.
Date: June 16, 2011Demurrer filed.
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Fee Waiver - Order re Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Diligence) filed.
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of L R Wagley) filed.
Date: July 13, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.