Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Professional Collection Consultants vs. Jeffrey Goldsmith
On November 03, 2010 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 03, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
10 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration Re: Accrued Interest CCP Section 585 d) filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration Re: Attorney Fees) filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration Under CCP 1033 b Re: Letter Advising Of Superior Court Filing; Order Authorizing Costs) filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration Re: Open Book Account) filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Goldsmith, Jeffrey on Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) . | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/09/2010 . | |
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons submitted by Professional Collection Consultants rejected on 11/12/2010 . |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 44 .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|