Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Froude, Jonathan V., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 03, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions555 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1699 days |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: December 15, 2011Stipulation and Order filed.
Date: January 26, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation (Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment) filed.
Date: February 01, 2012Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 29, 2015Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 11, 2012Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-11-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk''s Judgment filed.
Date: January 18, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.