Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wright, Steve, Wright, Carol, All Professional Realty Inc, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Karen M Goodman, against Does 1-100, Century 21 Real Estate Llc, represented by Aaron P Rudin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Minutes finalized for Motion for Preliminary Injunction heard on 11/05/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: November 05, 2010Declaration - Other (of C Wright in support) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed.
Date: October 14, 2010Answer filed.
Date: October 20, 2010Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (supplemental of V Rogers in support) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of V Rogers in support) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Carol Wright in support of request for preliminary injunction) filed.
Date: October 14, 2010Declaration - Other (of S Wright in support) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Steve Wright in support of request for preliminary injunction) filed.
Date: October 14, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: October 26, 2010Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: October 21, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.