Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ramirez, Patrick, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Scott A Coben, against Gallegos, Alfred, Does 1 To 100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions363 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time463 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 11, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: August 08, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-11-15T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: September 28, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.