Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kang, Won Sil, Kang, Tu Hui, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anna K Oh, Jean Schaefer, against Hambey, William James, Does 1-20, represented by Suzanne A Sherinian, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G. Virga Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions497 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time526 days |
Declaration - Other (of J Schaefer in support) filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 08, 2012Answer filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: March 08, 2012Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: January 17, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement Conference date and trial date) filed.
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Jury Fee Request For Refund - Approved filed.
Date: February 08, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.