Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sutton, Gabriel, Owens, Jessica, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Stewart M Tabak, against Regents Of The University Of California, Does 1-100, represented by Kristine E Balogh, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Matthew J. Gary presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1180 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time1281 days |
Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.
Date: December 20, 2013Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of CMC Order) filed.
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.
Date: 2011-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-11-16T00:00:00Amended Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Request
Date: March 10, 2014Proposed Order filed.
Date: December 20, 2013Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-11-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.
Date: 2010-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00Demurrer (to first amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended) submitted by Sutton, Gabriel rejected on 11/01/2010 .
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-09T00:00:00Order - Other (Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) filed.
Date: 2010-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed.
Date: 2010-12-21T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-11-09T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2012-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2013-08-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Case Managmetn Conference Order) filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial Date; Order Thereon) filed.
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2013-09-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2013-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Correspondence (Reschedule hearing to 10/11/13 @ 9:30 a.m.) filed.
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2013-10-17T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed.
Date: 2013-11-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Katherine R. Gales) filed.
Date: March 12, 2014Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: March 10, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.