Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelkris Associates Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Terry A Duree, against Does 1-5, Silvey, Jose Annette, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time632 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.
Date: 2010-09-20T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: May 24, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-20T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-04-11T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-05-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: July 12, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: April 13, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.