Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelkris Associates Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Terry A Duree, against Bojorquez, Eva, Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time475 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: December 19, 2011Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Summons submitted by Kelkris Associates Inc rejected on 09/02/2010 .
Date: 2010-09-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Default denied as to Bojorquez, Eva on Amended Complaint .
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Writ of Execution Issued
Date: July 12, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 17, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 12, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: November 23, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.