Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Montenegro, Elsa, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2291 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: November 02, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration (C.C.P. 585(d))) filed.
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: February 28, 2013Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: October 13, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: September 22, 2014Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 20, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 15, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 07, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.