Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Mcbean, Pauline, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions525 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time548 days |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: October 06, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: August 30, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 06, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 08, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.