Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Service Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael K Sipes, against Does 1-10, Bystrowski, Robert P., Bystrowski, Heather D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1355 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: May 16, 2014Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 15, 2012Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: June 02, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: June 11, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 22, 2011Writ of Execution Issued
Date: July 19, 2012Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: May 16, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.