Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Assurance Company Of America As Subrogee Of Lewis & Bristow Builders, Caldwell, Kathryn, Chavez, Susan, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Michael W Goodin, Palmer J Swanson, against Caldwell, Carol J., Caldwell, Kathryn A., Carol J Caldwell Trustee, Carol T Baker As Trustee Of The Baker Trust, Chavez, John, (total of 13) See All represented by Bob Sims, Fred G Wiesner, Jennifer R Thomas, Mark R Wetters, Michael Dean Michel, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 06, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial557 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions579 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2027 days |
Ex Parte Application - Other (Substitution of Attorney) filed.
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for New Trial) filed.
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-07-19T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Gary Tecklenburg in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Objection (to Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (of Defendant Lewis & Bristow Builders To Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike) filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/22/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-08-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Palmer J Swanson In Support) filed.
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of B L Miller in support) filed.
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Stipulation for (Partial) Settlement; Order
Date: 2011-11-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (To Exclude Hearsay Evidence From April Goore) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Order for Appearance and Examination (Granted) filed.
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Exparte App re: Order Granting Leave to File Cross Complaint...) filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of S R Curran in support) filed.
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2011-06-23T00:00:00Request - Other (GRANTED Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Request for Additional Time for OSC Re Dismissal After Settlement (Granted)
Date: 2012-02-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Jennifer T in support of Oppisition to Plantiffs Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2012-04-11T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 To Exclude Evidence Of Plaintiff's Claim For Lost Rents) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other filed.
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (To Exclude Evidence of Collateral Source Payments) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/10/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudiction, 7/26/11, Dropped) filed.
Date: 2011-07-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter from Jennifer R. Thomas) filed.
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2012-12-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of L L Ashley III in support) filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED) filed.
Date: 2010-06-07T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (further responses to requests for production of docs set two) filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motions Submitted Document) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Order - Other filed.
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel, 6/10/11, Dropped) filed.
Date: 2011-06-02T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Oppisition to Plantiffs Motion for a new Trial) filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Request - Other (GRANTED Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-11-17T00:00:00Statement of Case filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (In support of Ex-Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (To Exclude Lay Opinion Evidence as to The Cause Or Origin of the Fire) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memo of P & As in Support of Memo of Costs) filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Lewis and Bristow Builders motion for leave to file cross-complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Barbara L. Miller In Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Trial Brief (Trial Brief of Defendant Lewis & Bristow Builders) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-09-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling on Motion to Strike Costs - Lewis & Bristow
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Mark Wetters in Support of Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs) filed.
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/20/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-05-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Mark Wetters In Support Of Oppositions To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Amended Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2012-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (of Thomas Baker And Carol Baker To Plaintiffs Motion To Tax Costs) filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed.
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed.
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion for New Trial - Post Trial Motions heard on 06/01/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Amended Judgment on Special Verdict (Costs Awarded)
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/29/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of F Wiesner in support) filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Tentative Ruling on Motion for New Trial
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Motionto Strike or Tax Costs) filed.
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (Of Thomas And Carol Baker To Motion In Limine Re April Goore Testimony) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Request) filed.
Date: 2012-02-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Jennifer Thomas in Support to Def Memo of Costs) filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Proposed Order filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirmation letter continuing MSJ from 7/8/11 to 7/26/11) filed.
Date: 2011-06-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 12/15/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Request to Appear by Telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of G. Brent Sims in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena (to Russ Auker) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/08/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-04-08T00:00:00Objection filed.
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of M W Goodin in opposition) filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Tentative Ruling on Motion to Strike Costs - Baker
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:0034-2009-00040491-CU-IC-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2010-00086176-CU-PO-GDS on 01/31/2011 .
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00Correspondence
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00Order - Other (Continuance Request-Granted (Motion continued from 4/8/11 to 04/29/11)) filed.
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel Continued to 6/10/11) filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Order - Other (Order to Continue Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2011-05-10T00:00:00Order - Other (Continuance Request-Granted (MSJ Continued from 7/8/11 to 7/26/11)) filed.
Date: 2011-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-07-18T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Opposition (re: Mot/Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Stuart R Curran) filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Barbara L Miller) filed.
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Continue Trial Date..) filed.
Date: 2011-12-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/21/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Barbara L Miller in support of def's Motion to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Jury Fee Request For Refund - Approved filed.
Date: 2012-01-03T00:00:00Order - Other (to move Motion to continue trial) filed.
Date: 2011-12-22T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2011-12-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/23/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-10-20T00:00:00Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/30/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Palmer J Swanson) filed.
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2012-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Mot In Limine No. 3 - Exclude Evidence Not Produced During Discovery) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2012-03-07T00:00:00Exhibit List (Plaintiff's First Amended Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Trial Brief (Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Disputed Jury Instructions for Liability Phase of Trial) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/14/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-14T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/13/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/07/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-07T00:00:00Proposed Special Verdict filed.
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/08/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2011-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2011-09-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of P R Bonotto) filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Palmer J Swanson) filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (By Facsmile) filed.
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed.
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Barbara L Miller) filed.
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/05/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Proposed Special Verdict filed.
Date: 2012-03-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/06/2012 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-06T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Court's Response to Jury Request No. 1
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment and Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/21/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Jury Request No. 1
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Jury Request No. 2
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Judgment - After Jury Trial on Verdict filed.
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Special Verdict Form (Negligence)
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Proposed Special Verdict filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2012-04-05T00:00:00Exhibit List (Court's Final) filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Exhibit List (Defendant's Final) filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Exhibit List (Plaintiff's Final) filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Court Reporter Roster
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Memo of Costs and Mot for Expert Witness Fees) filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial filed.
Date: 2012-04-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/27/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/19/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/12/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/20/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 03/22/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Palmer J Swanson) filed.
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Peter J. Swanson in) filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Palmer J Swanson) filed.
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Palmer J. Swanson) filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-08-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Mark Wetters and Request for Hearing) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Request - Other (Plaintiff's Request for Jury Instructions) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (To Exclude Evidence Of Settlements Reached With Assurance Company Of America) filed.
Date: 2012-03-05T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment submitted by Chavez, Susan M rejected on 05/20/2013 .
Date: May 20, 2013Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 02/14/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-02-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment submitted by Chavez, Susan M rejected on 03/07/2013 .
Date: March 07, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 17, 2013Writ of Execution submitted by Lewis & Bristow Builders rejected on 03/25/2014 .
Date: March 25, 2014Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: September 05, 2014Writ of Execution submitted by Lewis & Bristow Builders rejected on 01/17/2014 .
Date: January 17, 2014Affidavit - Other filed.
Date: August 28, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 14, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.