Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Citibank South Dakota N A vs. Malcolm E Wong
On August 19, 2010 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Citibank South Dakota N A, represented by Janalie Henriques, against Wong, Malcolm E., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David W. Abbott;Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
2 years, 7 months and 26 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer (Amended Answer to Complaint) filed. |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed. |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 09/20/2012 09:00:00 AM . |
|
September 20, 2012 | hearing |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 09/20/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed. |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/20/2010 . | |
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 39 .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|