Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N Winn, against Does 1-10, Hagler, Aubrey G., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 16, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions648 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time648 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed.
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2012-05-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-11-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Submissions on Motion to Deem Facts Admitted) filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed.
Date: May 25, 2012Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-10-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2010-09-02T00:00:00Certification for Short Cause Matters filed.
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Declaration in Lieu of Testimony filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 25, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.