Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Singh, Bhajan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mark La Rocque, against Sheikh, Firdos, Does 1-20, Darling, Melissa, Baptiste, Jennifer, represented by John P Hallissy, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 10, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions469 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time2030 days |
Order - Other (Order Re: Sanctions) filed.
Date: 2011-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-04-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 22, 2011Motion to Compel - Other (Deponents Attendance at Depo) filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/23/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: October 27, 2011Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/20/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: November 03, 2011Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-12-06T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: March 01, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: November 28, 2011Motion to Compel - Other submitted by Baptiste, Jennifer rejected on 07/22/2011 .
Date: 2011-07-22T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Ruling) filed.
Date: 2011-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2010-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (deponent's attendance at depo) filed.
Date: 2011-07-25T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Notice - Other (Order) filed.
Date: 2011-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-05-26T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-07-26T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment submitted by Baptiste, Jennifer; Darling, Melissa rejected on 08/24/2011 .
Date: 2011-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-10-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2011-08-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Deponent's Attendance at Deposition) filed.
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.