Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Does 1-10, Prasad, Dular, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 02, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions121 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time226 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: March 16, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-08-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support of Judgment by Default Re: Attorneys Fee) filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Declaration - Other (in support of Judgment by Default RE: Interest) filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Declaration - Other (in support of Judgment by Default) filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals) filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.