Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Susan M Benson, against Ryzhova, Veronika V., Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 02, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions234 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time651 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: November 09, 2011Request - Court Judgment filed.
Date: June 02, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-06-02T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: November 09, 2011Certificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment
Date: May 14, 2012Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: December 27, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.