Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cal Acoustic Interiors Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by William J Sweeney, against Shrestha, Samjhana, Patel, A J., Does 1-10, Does 1-100, Comco Commercial Real Estate & Development Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by William Dedman, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 28, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time334 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-18T00:00:00Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case generated .
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 25, 2011Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case generated .
Date: March 21, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-16T00:00:00Summons (Summons Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case generated .
Date: March 25, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 21, 2011Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: March 29, 2011Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/04/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: April 27, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-06-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (discovery responses) filed.
Date: 2010-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.