Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Richard L Mahfouz, Ii, against Anderson, Rebekah, Does 1-40, Moeckly, Raichel, represented by David Hirshik, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management202 days |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions927 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time987 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Qualification Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Declaration of Arbitrator Unavailability filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Declaration of Arbitrator Unavailability filed.
Date: 2011-04-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: December 10, 2012Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2012-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: November 19, 2012Qualification Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2012-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration) filed.
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice Of Intent To Introduce Documentary Evidence At Arbitration) filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Request filed.
Date: 2010-12-16T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar heard on 06/15/2012 03:36:00 PM .
Date: 2012-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: November 08, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.