Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sacramento Kings Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bruce A Scheidt, against Sacramento Male Clinic Inc, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 06, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time407 days |
Opposition filed.
Date: January 05, 2011Request for Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of demurrer to complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Amended - in Support of Request for Court Judgment) filed.
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order with ruling on Petition for Writ of Mandate dated October 4, 2010
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:003DCA Order Petition for Writ of Mandate is Denied C066484
Date: 2010-11-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support) filed.
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Ruth Hill In Support Of Request For Court Judgment) filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 27, 2011Petition for Writ
Date: 2010-09-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Geoffrey E Woo-Ming in support of demurrer to the complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: June 17, 2011Declaration - Other (Of Tyler E Folock In Support Of Request For Court Judgment) filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-05-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-05-06T00:00:00Summons submitted by Sacramento Kings LP rejected on 05/06/2010 .
Date: 2010-05-06T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-05-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Demario L Belk) filed.
Date: 2010-08-16T00:00:00Demurrer (and motion to quash service of summons) filed.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (to Quash Service of Summons) filed.
Date: 2010-09-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Summons) filed.
Date: 2010-09-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Geoffrey E Woo-Ming in support of motion to quash service of summons) filed.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of motion to quash service of summons) filed.
Date: 2010-08-23T00:00:00Reply - Other (to Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Summons) filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default submitted by Sacramento Kings LP rejected on 12/08/2010 .
Date: 2010-12-08T00:00:00Judgment By Default Court-Rejected
Date: April 14, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: June 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.