Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael S Hunt, against Does 1-, Hoxworth Iii, Edward L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions95 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 13, 2020Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 01, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 13, 2020Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-06-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: September 15, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 29, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 13, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.