Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Pearson, Joel, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions213 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2890 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: (Unjust Enrichment) filed.
Date: September 27, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2010-03-12T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk''s Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 16, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 24, 2013Declaration - Other (Declaration re Waiver of Interest) filed.
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: July 12, 2013Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-06-14T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: February 29, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 25, 2012Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 25, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.