Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Advantage Assets Ii Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Does 1-10, Correa, Toni C., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions207 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2407 days |
Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: September 01, 2016Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: August 24, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: August 24, 2010Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration) filed.
Date: August 24, 2010Writ of Execution (los angeles) Issued
Date: December 07, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-17T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: August 24, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.