Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven D Cribb, against Bernardoni, Ronald, B&W Family Properties Llc, Cummings, Keith, Excel Catering Inc, Keolanui, Michael, (total of 12) See All represented by Lisa E Aguiar, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Matthew J. Gary presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management595 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions815 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3368 days |
Reply - Other (in support) filed.
Date: 2010-08-11T00:00:00Demurrer (to Third Cause of Action for Breach of Contract) filed.
Date: 2010-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (Portions of Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 01, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-29T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application (Writ of Execution) filed.
Date: March 28, 2014Demurrer filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Order - Other (Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (GTD)) filed.
Date: 2012-05-16T00:00:00Demurrer (to Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (First) filed.
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Issuance of a Writ of Execution) filed.
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination-Granted as to name that appears in #1.
Date: 2012-08-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Rendering and Entry of Judgment) filed.
Date: 2012-05-03T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2012-08-14T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (Settlement Stipulation and Conditional Dismissal) filed.
Date: 2012-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 01, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-03-07T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-03-21T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-09T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2011-02-03T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-09-17T00:00:00Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (on Demurrer to Third Cause of Action for Breach of Contract) filed.
Date: 2010-05-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (of intent to appear by telephone) filed.
Date: 2010-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Request filed.
Date: 2011-09-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2012-05-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 07/17/2012 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2012-07-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 10/22/2012 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Lawrence H Cassidy) filed.
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Writ issued .
Date: March 28, 2014Writ of Execution (Sac) Issued
Date: April 13, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.