Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Does 1-100, Jackson, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions178 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time178 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 22, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: January 29, 2010Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: June 22, 2010Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: July 08, 2010Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: May 24, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: February 11, 2010Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: July 19, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.