Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N Winn, against Does 1-100, Phetphayboune, Sabrina, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration RE Calculation of Interest and Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Name and Address Change of Plaintiffs Counsel) filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2010-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: August 15, 2011Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-11-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: March 02, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 04, 2013Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: April 22, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: May 15, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: June 27, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.