Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Btg Egz Investment Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Byron Stephen Georgiou, against Reynen & Bardis, Does 1 - 100, represented by Thomas B Sheridan, Carl P Blaine, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time1162 days |
Stipulated Judgment for Deficiency After Foreclosure Sale
Date: May 17, 2011Declaration - Other (of J H McCardle in support) filed.
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00Application - Other (for Entry of Judgment by Stipulation) filed.
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Stipulated Judgment for Foreclosure and Order for Sale
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (for Entry of Judgment of Foreclosure and Order of Sale) filed.
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for entry of judgment by stip of foreclosure and order of sale) filed.
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-09-16T00:00:00Amended Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment
Date: 2010-03-02T00:00:00Proposed Judgment submitted by BTG EGZ Investment LLC rejected on 07/26/2010 .
Date: 2010-07-26T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jill Clark...) filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John H McCardle) filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Byron Georgiou) filed.
Date: 2010-02-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney submitted by Reynen & Bardis (Laguna Ridge) LP rejected on 05/21/2010 .
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00Writ of attachment issued
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-04-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Agreement for deposit in lieu of bond CCP 489.210, 995.710) filed.
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-07-20T00:00:00Writ of Attachment Returned filed.
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by BTG EGZ Investment LLC rejected on 09/13/2010 .
Date: 2010-09-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by BTG EGZ Investment LLC rejected on 09/08/2010 .
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2010-09-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-09-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2010-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-04-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: June 21, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied (Sale - Sacramento) filed.
Date: February 28, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 05, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: June 13, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.