Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
City Of Galt, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Claudia J Gorham, against Ups Capital Business Credit A Connecticut Corporation Successor, Salas, Constance L., Salas, Benjamin A., Point West Bank, Glenna Jenkins Trustee, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions20 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: April 13, 2010Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Order for prejudgment porssession-Action in eminent domain
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Final Order of Condmenation Action in Eminent Domain
Date: May 03, 2010Order Determining Disposition of Ex parte Application
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Statement - Other (Disclaimer of Interest of Defendant Constance L Salas) filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Statement - Other (Tax Collector's Certification of Information) filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: April 15, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Judgment in Condemnation - Action in Eminent Domain
Date: April 20, 2010Order for certification by tax collector
Date: 2010-02-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (prejudgment possession) filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (order for prejudgment possession) filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-03-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: May 03, 2010Notice of Lis Pendens filed.
Date: June 04, 2010Notice - Other (Release of Lis Pendens) filed.
Date: May 21, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.