Velasquez, Eduardo Barajas,
Balbuena, Veronica,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Details for
Velasquez, Eduardo Barajas v.
, et al.
Case Events for
Velasquez, Eduardo Barajas v.
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 12, 2010
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/12/2010 09:00:00 AM .
March 12, 2010
Hearing
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Heard
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
March 12, 2010
Docket Event
Decree Changing Name
March 11, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service by Publication filed.
February 01, 2010
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/12/2010 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Petition for Change of Name filed.
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department 54 .
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Fee Waiver - Order re Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed.