Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven D Cribb, against Byron-White, Catherine Kristine, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert M. Twiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Twiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: April 14, 2010Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: May 06, 2010Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 08, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued for Sac Co) Issued
Date: April 14, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: April 20, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 14, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.