Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maryland Casulaty Company, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Abasi, Soleiman, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Loren E. McMaster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren E. McMaster Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of petition to compel policy appraisal) filed.
Date: 2010-01-11T00:00:00Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) filed.
Date: 2010-01-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Linda J Lynch in support of petition to compel) filed.
Date: 2010-01-11T00:00:00Response (to Petition to Compel Appreisal) submitted by Abasi, Soleiman rejected on 01/25/2010 .
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Response (to Maryland Casualty's Petition to Compel Appraisal) filed.
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/10/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: February 10, 2010Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Maryland Casualty's Petition) filed.
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Olga Clausen in support of petition to compel policy appraisal) filed.
Date: 2010-01-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of plf's Opposition to Maryland Casualty's Petition) filed.
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing (on petition to compel appraisal) filed.
Date: 2010-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2010-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: 2010-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.