State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Lewis, Jovance D.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Lewis, Jovance D.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Lewis, Jovance D.
Date
Type
Description
June 13, 2012
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
February 06, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
July 25, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
June 20, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .