State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Moreno, Christopher M.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Moreno, Christopher M.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Moreno, Christopher M.
Date
Type
Description
March 01, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
October 18, 2011
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
February 16, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
November 29, 2010
Docket Event
Final Return to Court Writ of Execution rec'd from Sacramento County Sheriff without original writ attached
November 29, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
May 26, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .