State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Knox, Gregory L.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Knox, Gregory L.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Knox, Gregory L.
Date
Type
Description
August 23, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 22, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 22, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
September 23, 2014
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
July 14, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 14, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
June 25, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 30, 2009
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.