Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Geico General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andrew R De La Flor, Leigh Charness, against Edwards, Michael Anthony, Does 1-10, Aguirre, Paula L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed.
Date: September 27, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 25, 2011Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Wendy Meador) filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment
Date: July 29, 2011Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 06, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: June 22, 2011Declaration - Other (Declaration of Ikaika Kelan Sakai) filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: July 09, 2018Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: July 24, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 26, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.