Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pacific Credit Exchange, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Frank G Blundo, Jr, against Smith, Charlotta, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Brian R. Van Camp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian R. Van Camp Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time293 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 15, 2010Answer filed.
Date: February 19, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 06, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: July 27, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.