Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harvey, Rachel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John P Hallissy, Patrick L Hinrichsen, against Akinsdunbar, Joseph, Akins-Dunbar, Joseph, Akinsdunbar, Melvin, Akinsdunbar, Sylva, Akins-Dunbar, Sylvia, (total of 37) See All represented by Aaron F Macleitch, J Brian Powers, Jodie G Steinberg, Lauren E Mistretta, Michael C. Kronlund, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions755 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1376 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-01-25T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-06T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Mot/Consolidate) filed.
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 05, 2013Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-07-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.
Date: July 03, 2013Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-02T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-05-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-26T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Pillado, Jason rejected on 01/23/2013 .
Date: 2013-01-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by Pillado, Jason rejected on 09/02/2011 .
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Order - Other (Notice of Settlement and Application for Good Faith Settlement; Order) filed.
Date: 2012-10-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-02T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-16T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-02T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-16T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-05-14T00:00:00Answer (Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2012-06-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-07-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-02T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Not Doe) filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-02T00:00:00Answer (To 1st Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-02-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/27/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Answer submitted by Reed, Debra rejected on 08/02/2010 .
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Summons (Summons Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of order Re Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-09-13T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/19/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-09-19T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-28T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-10-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-09-03T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Stipulation Regarding Answer of CA Builders Appliance Inc. (Granted)
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-01-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-10-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-01-19T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-08-14T00:00:00Answer submitted by Reed, Debra rejected on 07/13/2010 .
Date: 2010-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-08-07T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-04-07T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-09T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-01-25T00:00:00Answer submitted by Reed, Debra rejected on 03/18/2010 .
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-19T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-07-23T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of S M Campora in support) filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-12T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-11T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal submitted by Harvey, Rachel rejected on 11/01/2010 .
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (a further response to special rogs set two interrogatory no 18) filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-09-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2011-06-15T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Opposition (Sears Roebuck And Co's Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel) filed.
Date: 2011-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/26/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-05T00:00:00Answer submitted by Sandoval, Adriana rejected on 07/16/2010 .
Date: 2010-07-16T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Re: Determination of GFS) filed.
Date: 2012-10-10T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: July 17, 2013Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-05-21T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by Pillado, Jason rejected on 09/28/2011 .
Date: 2011-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Answer submitted by Endicott, Bart rejected on 07/13/2010 .
Date: 2010-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-26T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order filed.
Date: 2011-08-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-02-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-03-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING submitted by Reed, Debra rejected on 04/30/2010 .
Date: 2010-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (By Mail Cross Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (By Mail-Summons on Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (By Mail Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (by mail cross complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint submitted by Sears Roebuck and Company rejected on 07/01/2010 .
Date: 2010-07-01T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-16T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 27, 2013Summons (Amended Summons for Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2010-04-09T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-08-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-09T00:00:00Motion - Other (for an order quashing subpoena for production of records) filed.
Date: 2011-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Only as to Cross-Complaint Bart Endicott) filed.
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-08-27T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-16T00:00:00Answer submitted by Harvey, Rachel rejected on 08/02/2010 .
Date: 2010-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-12-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-01-18T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend filed.
Date: 2010-07-28T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-06-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by Pillado, Jason rejected on 09/15/2011 .
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney submitted by Harvey, Rachel rejected on 11/05/2010 .
Date: 2010-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2010-03-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-05-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Steven M Campora) filed.
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Default Judgment Status Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-06-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of J Brian Powers) filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (supplemental) filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-07-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-08-31T00:00:00Amendment filed.
Date: 2011-09-09T00:00:00Amendment filed.
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other submitted by Harvey, Rachel rejected on 01/12/2012 .
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Andrew J. Kozlow) filed.
Date: 2012-08-10T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Notice of Settlement / Application for Order Determining Good Faith, etc.
Date: 2012-08-16T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: July 18, 2013Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: June 17, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.