Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Davis, Samantha J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Request for Dismissal (The unjust enrichment cause of action as to all parties) filed.
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: August 15, 2014Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: November 04, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: May 21, 2012Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 08, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.