Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Earthquake Authority, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael Jay Strumwasser, against Wachovia Bank National Association, Metropolitan West Securities Llc, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Notice - Other (regarding Assignment of permanent federal case number of removed action) filed.
Date: February 05, 2010Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Plead filed.
Date: February 03, 2010Motion - Other (to Disqualify Counsel for Defendants) filed.
Date: December 31, 2009Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/18/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: February 18, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2009Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Ntc of mtn & Mtn to disqualify counsel for defendants) filed.
Date: January 19, 2010Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: February 04, 2010Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 04, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.