Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robinson, Frajan, $675.00, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against The People Of The State Of California, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Loren E. McMaster presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time208 days |
Motion to Compel - Other (request for production of docs) filed.
Date: May 21, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: December 31, 2009Claim Opposing Forfeiture of Property filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: July 27, 2010Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 08, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.