Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miklaus, Misty, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by S David Rosenthal, against Rempp, Kimerli, Miller, Darrin, Does 1 To 50, represented by Gregory V Debernard, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions313 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time344 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 08, 2010Answer submitted by Miller, Darrin; Rempp, Kimberly rejected on 04/02/2010 .
Date: 2010-04-02T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kent M Luckey in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) filed.
Date: 2010-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) filed.
Date: 2010-07-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.