Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelkris Associates Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Terry A Duree, against Anderson, Lynetta Patricia, Davis Ii, Ronnie L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: April 26, 2019Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: September 17, 2018Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: September 15, 2010Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: September 14, 2010Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: October 03, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 07, 2016Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: September 23, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.