Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Richard E Golden, against Hong, Vantha, Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time287 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: March 01, 2010Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 28, 2010Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant To Interest Calculation) filed.
Date: March 01, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Plaintiff In Support Of Default Judgment) filed.
Date: March 01, 2010Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 1033b) filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (Proof of Service Summons;Complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Plaintiffs Attorney Waiving Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: May 28, 2010Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: September 15, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.