Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Fields, Bobby, Fields, Audra, Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions78 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 02, 2009Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 16, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: January 12, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 12, 2010Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: March 30, 2010Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: February 24, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.