Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hamey, Laura, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Thomas Santistevan, against Robertson, Berenice, Paradise Park Llc, Does 1 To 10, represented by Mike Mcguire, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions471 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time471 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-26T00:00:00Qualification Statement filed.
Date: March 09, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 04, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-05T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous ADR Document filed.
Date: 2011-02-07T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: February 24, 2011Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: March 09, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.