Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williams, Robert, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by John W Beebe, against Morgan, Bill, Moore, Cheryl, Moe, John, Duvall, David, Does 1-50, (total of 6) See All represented by Michael A Bishop, Jeffrey U Javinar, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions646 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time650 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: September 13, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 09, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-01-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement Conference and Trial dates) filed.
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.