Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wiseman, Cassandra, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Jason A Ewing, against Coloma Townehomes Homeowners Association, Does 1 To 100, Frei Real Estate Services, represented by Richard H Martha, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions511 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time567 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-10-29T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint: Order
Date: 2010-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: April 27, 2011Answer filed.
Date: 2010-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-12-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: November 18, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.