Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gamino, Adriana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David C Rancano, against Squires, Lindsey, Does 1-100, Boorse, Derek, represented by Renee G Cash, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions556 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time556 days |
Request for Dismissal submitted by Gamino, Adriana rejected on 05/19/2011 .
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00Answer submitted by Squires, Lindsey Renee; Boorse, Derek rejected on 02/26/2010 .
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (entire action w/prejudice)
Date: June 01, 2011Stipulation and Order to Mediation (granted)
Date: 2011-03-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed.
Date: 2011-02-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-01-13T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Lien Claim) filed.
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: June 10, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.