Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lm Combs Construction Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ronald L Carello, against Southgate Recreation & Park District, Does 1 - 20, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Brian R. Van Camp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian R. Van Camp Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial671 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions706 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time710 days |
Motion in Limine (Motion to Exclude Evidence re: The Correctness of the Plans & Specifications) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Trial Brief (Trial Brief Of L.M. Combs Construction) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-12-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 19, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-12-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion In Limine No.5) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (to Exclude expert opinions;declaration of John E Cassinat) filed.
Date: 2011-08-08T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No 3 Of 4) filed.
Date: 2011-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 of 4) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion In Limine) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 of 4) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 of 4) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion to Exclude Evidence re: Supposed Conspiracy) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Statement of Case filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion to Exclude Evidencence re: Meaning of Contract Interpretation) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order re: Settlement
Date: August 19, 2011Motion in Limine (Motion to Exclude Evidence re: Certain Expert Testimony) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion to Exclude Evidence re: Monetary Damages) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 of 4) filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed.
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney submitted by Southgate Recreation & Park District rejected on 07/05/2011 .
Date: 2011-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2011-03-08T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2011-07-07T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 08/15/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial set on 08/17/2011 10:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2011-08-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.